THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:24:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Boright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boright (CPSO#: 65047 )
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LMC Endocrinology
Suite 107
1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 645-2929
Fax: (416) 645-2930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Boright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boright (CPSO#: 65047 )
Business Address: LMC Endocrinology
107 - 1929 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4G 3E8
(416) 645-2929

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW PEPLER BORIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW PEPLER BORIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992