THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:00:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 40054
Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (800) 785-1519
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pankaj Chand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chand (CPSO#: 65048 )
Business Address: Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
PO Box 40054
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: P O Box 40054
Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (800) 785-1519
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2003
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2003
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pankaj Chand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Chand (CPSO#: 65048 )
Business Address: Waterloo Town Square
75 King Street South
PO Box 40054
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANKAJ PAPPU CHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PANKAJ PAPPU CHAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of March 2, 2018, Dr. Chand completed the requirements of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Aug 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of March 2, 2018, Dr. Chand completed the requirements of his SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP: 

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 1992