THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:41:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KACHCHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Kingsway Health Centre
Box 819
5542 Ann Street First Floor
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdulla (CPSO#: 65052 )
Business Address: The Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann Street, 1st Floor
P.O. Box 819
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A7
(613) 692-5433

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, KACHCHI
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Kingsway Health Centre
Box 819
5542 Ann Street First Floor
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdulla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdulla (CPSO#: 65052 )
Business Address: The Kingsway Health Centre
5542 Ann Street, 1st Floor
P.O. Box 819
Manotick Ontario K4M 1A7
(613) 692-5433

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYKHAN SADRUDIN ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALYKHAN SADRUDIN ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992