THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:53:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-7200
Fax: (705) 444-7203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew J. Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weisbrod (CPSO#: 65054 )
Business Address: The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C4
(705) 444-7200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 444-7200
Fax: (705) 444-7203

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew J. Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weisbrod (CPSO#: 65054 )
Business Address: The Shipyards Medical Arts Centre
Family Medicine
Unit 100
28 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C4
(705) 444-7200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFERY WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JEFFERY WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992