THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:08:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33998
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 03 Feb 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe El-Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. El-Helou (CPSO#: 65074 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 300
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33998

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 39 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton ON L8N 1Y3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055221155
Extension: 33998
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 03 Feb 2011
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 03 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philippe El-Helou Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. El-Helou (CPSO#: 65074 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 300
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 522-1155 Extn: 33998

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE PHILIPPE EL-HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-HELOU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIPPE PHILIPPE EL-HELOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-HELOU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2001
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 18 Dec 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 1997

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992