THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:54:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059297791
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fabio Luison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Luison (CPSO#: 65086 )
Business Address: Suite 402
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 523-5626
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7059297791
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2001
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fabio Luison Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Luison (CPSO#: 65086 )
Business Address: Suite 402
2009 Long Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 6C3
(705) 523-5626
Business Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO LUISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUISON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FABIO LUISON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LUISON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992