THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:29:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gerrard Wing, Rm 3-522
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3172
Fax: (416) 340-4710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. S. Chauhan & Dr. M. Madan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chauhan (CPSO#: 65099 ) Dr. M. Madan (CPSO#: 66200 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Gerrard Wing, Rm 3-522
Toronto General Hospital
150 Gerrard Street West
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-3172
Fax: (416) 340-4710

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. S. Chauhan & Dr. M. Madan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Chauhan (CPSO#: 65099 ) Dr. M. Madan (CPSO#: 66200 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIJAY SINGH CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIJAY SINGH CHAUHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992