THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 04:45:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA, HINDI, MANDARIN, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166091859
Fax: 416-609-9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bob T.L. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chiu (CPSO#: 65105 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 609-1859
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HAKKA, HINDI, MANDARIN, URDU
Medical School: University of Madras, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 215-520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166091859
Fax: 416-609-9002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bob T.L. Chiu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chiu (CPSO#: 65105 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 302
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 609-1859
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1R 0B1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOBBY TING LIANG CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOBBY TING LIANG CHIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992