THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:10:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: Cook, Nathalie (Used Until: 08 Mar 2016)
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-291-9520
Fax: 613-738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Major (CPSO#: 65108 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2664

General Information

Former Name: Cook, Nathalie (Used Until: 08 Mar 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-291-9520
Fax: 613-738-4878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Major Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Major (CPSO#: 65108 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
(613) 737-7600 Extn: 2664

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NATHALIE MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992