THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:37:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-4500
Fax: (807) 345-4501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Biman & Telang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Telang (CPSO#: 65113 ) Dr. B. Biman (CPSO#: 65068 )
Business Address: 303 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 345-4500
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 303
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 345-4500
Fax: (807) 345-4501

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Biman & Telang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Telang (CPSO#: 65113 ) Dr. B. Biman (CPSO#: 65068 )
Business Address: 303 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
(807) 345-4500
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARSHAD TELANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARSHAD TELANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TELANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992