THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kemptville Medical Center
P O Box 1859
2670 HWY # 43
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-4600
Fax: (613) 258-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leahy (CPSO#: 65116 )
Business Address: 2670 Highway 43
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-4600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kemptville Medical Center
P O Box 1859
2670 HWY # 43
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 258-4600
Fax: (613) 258-2799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Leahy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Leahy (CPSO#: 65116 )
Business Address: 2670 Highway 43
Kemptville Ontario K0G 1J0
(613) 258-4600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PATRICK JOSEPH LEAHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEAHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992