THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:39:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H H S
Henderson General Site
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 318-9084
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Address: 1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-318-9084
Fax: 905-575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dereck Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hunt (CPSO#: 65122 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8Z 3Z5
(905) 318-9084
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 318-9084

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: H H S
Henderson General Site
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 318-9084
Fax: (905) 575-7320
Address: 1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-318-9084
Fax: 905-575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dereck Hunt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hunt (CPSO#: 65122 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8Z 3Z5
(905) 318-9084
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 318-9084

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERECK LESLIE HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DERECK LESLIE HUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUNT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992