THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:29:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 285 7575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly A. Keogh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Keogh (CPSO#: 65128 )
Business Address: 152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 285-7575

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1L2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 285 7575
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly A. Keogh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Keogh (CPSO#: 65128 )
Business Address: 152 - 1880 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1L 2L1
(416) 285-7575

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ANNETTE KEOGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEOGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KELLY ANNETTE KEOGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEOGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992