THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 16:33:42 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Simpson (CPSO#: 65136 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(612) 549-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 549-6666
Extension: 3225
Fax: (613) 548-1387

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 25 Nov 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Simpson (CPSO#: 65136 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
Armstrong 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(612) 549-6666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEVEN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEVEN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992