THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:42:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-6800 Morrison St.
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Homayoun Vahdat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vahdat (CPSO#: 65139 )
Business Address: Suite 4
6800 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6Z8
(905) 371-3217
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-6800 Morrison St.
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jamie Homayoun Vahdat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Vahdat (CPSO#: 65139 )
Business Address: Suite 4
6800 Morrison Street
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6Z8
(905) 371-3217
Business Address: 867 Upper Paradise Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 5R3
(905) 574-2500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE HOMAYOUN VAHDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHDAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMIE HOMAYOUN VAHDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAHDAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992