THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:25:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 1100
Extension: 5698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Toth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Toth (CPSO#: 65163 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners Credit Valley
Emergency Department
2G
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
905-813-1100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SLOVAK
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
Emergency Department
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 813 1100
Extension: 5698
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site Wiarton
Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation Haliburton
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Campbellford Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Campbellford

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Wiarton Site
LOCATION: Wiarton

HOSPITAL: Haliburton Highlands Health Services Corporation
LOCATION: Haliburton

HOSPITAL: Deep River and District Hospital
LOCATION: Deep River

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Toth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Toth (CPSO#: 65163 )
Business Address: 2200 Eglinton Ave W
Trillium Health Partners Credit Valley
Emergency Department
2G
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
905-813-1100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992