THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:50:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAY, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8405 Financial Drive
Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)455-9949
Fax: (905)812-5553

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avtar Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 65166 )
Business Address: 8405 Financial drive, Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
905-455-9949
Business Address: 8-50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G9
(905) 455-9949

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAY, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8405 Financial Drive
Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)455-9949
Fax: (905)812-5553

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avtar Dhanoa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dhanoa (CPSO#: 65166 )
Business Address: 8405 Financial drive, Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1M1
905-455-9949
Business Address: 8-50 Skyharbour Drive
Brampton Ontario L6Y 6G9
(905) 455-9949

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVTAR SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVTAR SINGH DHANOA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHANOA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Apr 2020
Summary of Decision:
On April 6, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr.Avtar Singh Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.
 
FACTS
 
Dr. Dhanoa is a 60-year-old family physician practicing in Brampton, Ontario. He obtained his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in 1993.

April 2016 criminal charges

On April 3, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “April 2016 charges”):

- Threatening death, contrary to s. 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

- Having in his possession a weapon, to wit a knife, for a purpose dangerous to the public peace, contrary to s. 88(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

- Having in his possession a prohibited weapon, to wit a knife, capable of being opened by centrifugal force, contrary to s. 91(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the April 2016 charges to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, being Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”).

Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognizance of bail, with conditions (the “April 2016 bail conditions”). Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his April 2016 bail conditions to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code.

The College did not learn of the April 2016 charges, or the April 2016 bail conditions, until September 2018, during the College’s investigation of the December 2016 charges (described below), which included an allegation that he had breached his April 2016 bail conditions.

On April 27, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2016 CPSO Annual Renewal Form. In doing so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the April 2016 charges. He falsely answered “No” to the question , April 1, 2015, have you been charged with any offence in Canada or elsewhere?”

On January 11, 2017, the April 2016 charges were withdrawn, and Dr. Dhanoa entered into a peace bond under s. 810 of the Criminal Code.

December 2016 criminal charges

On December 6, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “December 2016 charges”):

- Operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
- Operating a motor while having consumed alcohol in such a quantity that the concentration in the person’s blood exceeds eighty milligrams of alcohol in one hundred millilitres of blood contrary to s. 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
- Failing to comply with his recognizance of bail contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the December 2016 charges to the College until April 25, 2018.

On December 7, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognisance of bail, with conditions (the “December 2016 bail conditions”), including that he not buy, possess or consume alcohol. Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his December 2016 bail conditions to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code. The College did not learn of Dr. Dhanoa’s December 2016 bail conditions until April 2018, during its investigation of the December 2016 charges. On June 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2017 CPSO Annual Renewal Form, as attached at Tab 9 of the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability). In doing so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the December 2016 charges. He falsely answered “No” to the question, “Since April 1, 2016, have you been charged with, and/or found guilty of, any offences in Canada or elsewhere? (Include all offences under the Criminal Code of Canada, the controlled Drugs and Substances Act, the Food and Drugs Act, the Health Insurance Act, and/or related legislation in any province or jurisdiction. In addition, include any other offences related to the practice of medicine.)”

On November 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, was found guilty of, operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. The other two charges were withdrawn. By way of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was prohibited from driving for 12 months, fined $1,000, and ordered to pay a $300 victim surcharge. Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of guilt on the December 2016 offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired to the College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not report the finding of guilt on the offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired until April 25, 2018. The offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his suitability to practise.

August 2017 criminal charges

On August 4, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “August 2017 charges”):
- Assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada;
- Failing to comply with a recognizance of bail, contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
- Failing to comply with a recognizance, contrary to s. 811 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the August 2017 charges to the College in a timely manner. He did not report them to the College until April 25, 2018.

On March 26, 2018, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, and was found guilty of, assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada. The other two charges were withdrawn. By way of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was given a conditional discharge, placed on probation for three (3) years, ordered to submit his DNA, and was ordered to pay a $100 victim surcharge.

Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of guilt on the August 2017 charge of assault to the College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not disclose it to the College until April 25, 2018. The offence of assault contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his suitability to practise.

FINDING

 
The Committee found that Dr. Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

PENALTY AND COSTS

The Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months, commencing from April 8, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration:
- Dr. Dhanoa shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”;
- Dr. Dhanoa will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (“the PROBE program”) by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Dhanoa will complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.

The Committee ordered Dr. Dhanoa to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of the Order.o

DECISION AND REASONS

On June 26, 2020, the Committee released its full Decision and Reasons in this matter, available for review on the College’s website.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 May 2018
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
(1) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 1, 2017
SENTENCE: 12 month driving prohibition; Fine of $1000; Victim surcharge of $300.

(2) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Assault, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.

DATE: March 26, 2018
SENTENCE: Conditional discharge with 3 years’ probation; Victim surcharge of $100; DNA Order.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Apr 2020
Summary of Decision:
On April 6, 2020, on the basis of agreed facts and admission, the Discipline Committee (the “Committee”) of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr.Avtar Singh Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct. The Committee set out its penalty and costs order with written reasons to follow.
 
FACTS
 
Dr. Dhanoa is a 60-year-old family physician practicing in Brampton, Ontario. He obtained his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice from the College in 1993.

April 2016 criminal charges

On April 3, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “April 2016 charges”):

- Threatening death, contrary to s. 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada;

- Having in his possession a weapon, to wit a knife, for a purpose dangerous to the public peace, contrary to s. 88(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and

- Having in his possession a prohibited weapon, to wit a knife, capable of being opened by centrifugal force, contrary to s. 91(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the April 2016 charges to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, being Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991 (the “Code”).

Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognizance of bail, with conditions (the “April 2016 bail conditions”). Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his April 2016 bail conditions to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code.

The College did not learn of the April 2016 charges, or the April 2016 bail conditions, until September 2018, during the College’s investigation of the December 2016 charges (described below), which included an allegation that he had breached his April 2016 bail conditions.

On April 27, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2016 CPSO Annual Renewal Form. In doing so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the April 2016 charges. He falsely answered “No” to the question , April 1, 2015, have you been charged with any offence in Canada or elsewhere?”

On January 11, 2017, the April 2016 charges were withdrawn, and Dr. Dhanoa entered into a peace bond under s. 810 of the Criminal Code.

December 2016 criminal charges

On December 6, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “December 2016 charges”):

- Operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada;
- Operating a motor while having consumed alcohol in such a quantity that the concentration in the person’s blood exceeds eighty milligrams of alcohol in one hundred millilitres of blood contrary to s. 253(1)(b) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
- Failing to comply with his recognizance of bail contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the December 2016 charges to the College until April 25, 2018.

On December 7, 2016, Dr. Dhanoa was released on a recognisance of bail, with conditions (the “December 2016 bail conditions”), including that he not buy, possess or consume alcohol. Dr. Dhanoa failed to report his December 2016 bail conditions to the College, contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code. The College did not learn of Dr. Dhanoa’s December 2016 bail conditions until April 2018, during its investigation of the December 2016 charges. On June 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa completed his 2017 CPSO Annual Renewal Form, as attached at Tab 9 of the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability). In doing so, Dr. Dhanoa failed to disclose the December 2016 charges. He falsely answered “No” to the question, “Since April 1, 2016, have you been charged with, and/or found guilty of, any offences in Canada or elsewhere? (Include all offences under the Criminal Code of Canada, the controlled Drugs and Substances Act, the Food and Drugs Act, the Health Insurance Act, and/or related legislation in any province or jurisdiction. In addition, include any other offences related to the practice of medicine.)”

On November 1, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, was found guilty of, operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada. The other two charges were withdrawn. By way of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was prohibited from driving for 12 months, fined $1,000, and ordered to pay a $300 victim surcharge. Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of guilt on the December 2016 offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired to the College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not report the finding of guilt on the offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired until April 25, 2018. The offence of operating a motor vehicle while impaired contrary to s. 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his suitability to practise.

August 2017 criminal charges

On August 4, 2017, Dr. Dhanoa was charged with three criminal offences (the “August 2017 charges”):
- Assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada;
- Failing to comply with a recognizance of bail, contrary to s. 145(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada; and
- Failing to comply with a recognizance, contrary to s. 811 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Contrary to s. 85.6.4 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the August 2017 charges to the College in a timely manner. He did not report them to the College until April 25, 2018.

On March 26, 2018, Dr. Dhanoa pleaded guilty to, and was found guilty of, assault, contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada. The other two charges were withdrawn. By way of sentencing, Dr. Dhanoa was given a conditional discharge, placed on probation for three (3) years, ordered to submit his DNA, and was ordered to pay a $100 victim surcharge.

Contrary to s. 85.6.1 of the Code, Dr. Dhanoa failed to report the finding of guilt on the August 2017 charge of assault to the College in a timely manner. Dr. Dhanoa did not disclose it to the College until April 25, 2018. The offence of assault contrary to s. 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada, of which Dr. Dhanoa was found guilty, is relevant to his suitability to practise.

FINDING

 
The Committee found that Dr. Dhanoa committed an act of professional misconduct under clause 51(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practise; and under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, in that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

PENALTY AND COSTS

The Committee directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration for a period of five (5) months, commencing from April 8, 2020 at 12:01 a.m.

The Committee directed the Registrar to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Dhanoa’s certificate of registration:
- Dr. Dhanoa shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”;
- Dr. Dhanoa will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals (“the PROBE program”) by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. Dr. Dhanoa will complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it.

The Committee ordered Dr. Dhanoa to pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within thirty (30) days from the date of the Order.o

DECISION AND REASONS

On June 26, 2020, the Committee released its full Decision and Reasons in this matter, available for review on the College’s website.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): April 6, 2020 at 1:30 p.m.

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Other
Effective Date: 09 May 2018
Summary:
FINDINGS OF GUILT
(1) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Impaired operation of a motor vehicle, contrary to Section 253(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.

DATE: November 1, 2017
SENTENCE: 12 month driving prohibition; Fine of $1000; Victim surcharge of $300.

(2) Avtar Dhanoa was found guilty of the following offence:

1. Assault, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code.

DATE: March 26, 2018
SENTENCE: Conditional discharge with 3 years’ probation; Victim surcharge of $100; DNA Order.

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 08 Sep 2020
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992