THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:46:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite475
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 815-8885
Fax: (905) 815-8560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrighetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Andrighetti (CPSO#: 65168 )
Business Address: 475 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 815-8885

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite475
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 815-8885
Fax: (905) 815-8560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Zealand

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrighetti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Aug 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Andrighetti (CPSO#: 65168 )
Business Address: 475 - 2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
(905) 815-8885

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTINA ANDRIGHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRIGHETTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANTINA ANDRIGHETTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRIGHETTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992