THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:31:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke (CPSO#: 65170 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 445-4111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 445-4111
Fax: (705) 445-8250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet Clarke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Clarke (CPSO#: 65170 )
Business Address: Suite 305
1 Huron Street
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1C3
(705) 445-4111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET HELEN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET HELEN CLARKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARKE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992