THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:15:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 723 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 745-2366
Fax: (519) 745-9035
Address: 1370 Dundas st E
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4G4
Phone: (906) 306-9229
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saunders (CPSO#: 65189 )
Business Address: 723 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 723 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 745-2366
Fax: (519) 745-9035
Address: 1370 Dundas st E
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 4G4
Phone: (906) 306-9229
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Saunders Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Saunders (CPSO#: 65189 )
Business Address: 723 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1E3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERRARD SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERRARD SAUNDERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAUNDERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992