THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 14:43:41 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing Room 424
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: x46215
Fax: (905) 577-1418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell and Talman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talman (CPSO#: 65195 ) Dr. T. Mitchell (CPSO#: 68233 )
Business Address: 2 - 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
(905) 920-5650
Business Address: McMaster Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: HGH 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing Room 424
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: x46215
Fax: (905) 577-1418

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell and Talman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Nov 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Talman (CPSO#: 65195 ) Dr. T. Mitchell (CPSO#: 68233 )
Business Address: 2 - 75 Parkview Road
Hagersville Ontario N0A 1H0
(905) 920-5650
Business Address: McMaster Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: HGH 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE RUTH TALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIANNE RUTH TALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992