THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2920 Dufferin St
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-2211
Fax: (416) 782-2392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander E. Forcina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forcina (CPSO#: 65207 )
Business Address: 602 Caledonia Road
Toronto Ontario M6E 4V5
(416) 782-2211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2920 Dufferin St
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M6B 3S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 782-2211
Fax: (416) 782-2392

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alexander E. Forcina Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Forcina (CPSO#: 65207 )
Business Address: 602 Caledonia Road
Toronto Ontario M6E 4V5
(416) 782-2211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ERASMO FORCINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORCINA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ERASMO FORCINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORCINA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992