THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Handler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Handler (CPSO#: 65208 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(647) 262-6055
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(647) 262-6055

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Dec 1999
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Dec 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Handler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Handler (CPSO#: 65208 )
Business Address: 20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(647) 262-6055
Business Address: William Olser Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(647) 262-6055

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID HANDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID HANDLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANDLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 6, 2023,  at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Toronto), a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Jeffrey Handler, in respect of an incident that took place in November 2015.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 6, 2023,  at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice (Toronto), a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Jeffrey Handler, in respect of an incident that took place in November 2015.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992