THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Address: 480 huronia road Ste 207
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Hekkenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hekkenberg (CPSO#: 65209 )
Business Address: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, DUTCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330
Address: 480 huronia road Ste 207
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 726-6900
Fax: (705) 725-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Hekkenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hekkenberg (CPSO#: 65209 )
Business Address: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN HEKKENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEKKENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN HEKKENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEKKENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992