THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:54:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)495-2600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Khabbaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khabbaz (CPSO#: 65213 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)495-2600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited Toronto
Humber River Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Don Mills Surgical Unit Limited
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Khabbaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khabbaz (CPSO#: 65213 )
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 495-2600
Business Address: The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KHABBAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHABBAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMIR KHABBAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHABBAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992