THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:45:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-971-7601
Fax: 437-317-9601
Address: The Medical Clinic
2040 Sheppard Ave East, Unit A201
North York, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M2J 5B3
Phone: 416-229-2399
Fax: 416-229-9771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Wei Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Liu (CPSO#: 65215 )
Business Address: 1108-175 Cumberland St
Toronto ON M5R 3M9
4168073818

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-2 Saint Thomas St
Toronto ON M5S 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-971-7601
Fax: 437-317-9601
Address: The Medical Clinic
2040 Sheppard Ave East, Unit A201
North York, Ontario
Toronto Ontario M2J 5B3
Phone: 416-229-2399
Fax: 416-229-9771

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vivian Wei Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Liu (CPSO#: 65215 )
Business Address: 1108-175 Cumberland St
Toronto ON M5R 3M9
4168073818

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIVIAN WEI LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992