THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:28:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial St
Unify Men's Health
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
Unify Mens Health/Leaside Village Medical Centre
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 May 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bradley Noss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noss (CPSO#: 65220 )
Business Address: 377 Madison Ave
Toronto ON M4V 3E1
Business Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 341-9333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-25 Industrial St
Unify Men's Health
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511
Address: 208-25 Industrial St
Unify Mens Health/Leaside Village Medical Centre
East York ON M4G 1Z2
Phone: 416-745-1555
Fax: 416-745-1511

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 May 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bradley Noss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Apr 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Noss (CPSO#: 65220 )
Business Address: 377 Madison Ave
Toronto ON M4V 3E1
Business Address: 75 Charles Street
Brockville Ontario K6V 1S8
(613) 341-9333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY NOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOSS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK BRADLEY NOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOSS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992