THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Asano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Asano (CPSO#: 65227 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
General Physician Mail
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
416-284-8131 Extn: 4560
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Medical Crt
Suite 310
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 286-9729

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Asano Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jun 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Asano (CPSO#: 65227 )
Business Address: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
General Physician Mail
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
416-284-8131 Extn: 4560
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary Medical Crt
Suite 310
2863 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 5E9
(416) 286-9729

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACEY KIM ASANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASANO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TRACEY KIM ASANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASANO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992