THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:07:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary
DI
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Site
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-601 Harwood Ave S
Ellesmere X-Ray: Ajax
Ajax ON L1S 2J5
Phone: 905-683-8877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205 Frances St E
Box 118
Fenelon Falls Diagnostic
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
Phone: 1-705-887-2244
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Extension: 2326
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Kingston Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Pickering
Pickering ON L1V 1A0
Phone: 905-839-1806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Site
3050 Lawrence Ave E.
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284-8131
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S4
Phone: (416) 495-2480
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2880 Ellesmere Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Ellesmere Location
Scarborough ON M1E 4B8
Phone: 416-284-1697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 315-1333 Neilson Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Neilson Location
Scarborough ON M1B 4Y9
Phone: 416-287-1222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ll4-4040 Finch Ave E
Ellesmere X-Ray: Milliken Finch
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-292-1505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Gazzola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gazzola (CPSO#: 65241 )
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Bio-Test Radiology Services
2006 Robertson Road, Suite 16
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
(613) 789-4242
Business Address: Don Valley X-Ray & Ultrasound Services Ltd.
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1Z1
(416) 461-9891
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
LL4 Basement
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 292-1505
Business Address: Muskoka Algonguin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404
Business Address: Lakeview Diagnostics, EMP Diagnostic
Ultrasound Inc.
516 Lightfoot Place
Pickering Ontario L1V 5Z8
(905) 420-7158
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
650 Kingston Road
Unit 2, Building C
Pickering Ontario L1V 3N7
(905) 839-1806
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
Suite 107
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 683-8877
Business Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada
Suite 3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
(416) 507-6611
Business Address: Don Mills Diagnostic Imaging Inc.
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
(416) 449-2166
Business Address: 2352726 Ontario Inc
North York - X-Ray & Nuclear
250 Marlee Avenue
North York Ontario M6B 3H7
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: 103-2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 763-4331
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-1697
Business Address: 103-3101 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2W2
(416) 239-3568
Business Address: 2447648 Ontario Inc.
North York - US & XR
2640 Rutherford Road, Suite 102
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
(905) 417-3001
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
315 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 284-1697
Business Address: Bio-Test Radiology Services
1929 Russell Road, Suite 102
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
(613) 737-6872
Business Address: 2352726 Ontario Inc
250 Marlee Avenue
North York Ontario M6B 3H7
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-0022
Business Address: Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 119-230 First Ave
Elgin Imaging Services
2581347 Ontario Limited
St Thomas ON N5R 4P5
519-282-5851
Business Address: 99 Firvalley Crt
Warden Woods X-Ray and Ultrasound
Scarborough ON M1L 1P2
416-699-6222
Business Address: 3-2 Thompson Cres
Erin Diagnostic Imaging
Erin ON N0B 1T0
Business Address: 1-1679 County Rd 22
St. Thomas Ultrasound Services - Belle River Imaging
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Business Address: 207-510 Ingersoll Ave
Woodstock Diagnostic Imaging
2581347 Ontario Limited
Woodstock ON N4S 4X9
519-539-8888
Business Address: 468 Main St E
Beaverton X-Ray and Ultrasound
Beaverton ON L0K 1A0
705-504-0880
Business Address: 207-1980 St Clair Ave W
City X-Ray and Ultrasound
11003356 Canada Limited
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
416-534-8487
Business Address: 600 The East Mall
Ontario Imaging Centre - Etobicoke
AB6T Xray Only
Etobicoke ON M9B 4B0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centenary
DI
Scarborough ON M1E 4B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-284-8131
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health - Ajax Pickering Site
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 107-601 Harwood Ave S
Ellesmere X-Ray: Ajax
Ajax ON L1S 2J5
Phone: 905-683-8877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L2E4
Phone: 705-645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205 Frances St E
Box 118
Fenelon Falls Diagnostic
Fenelon Falls Ontario K0M 1N0
Phone: 1-705-887-2244
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Extension: 2326
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1815 Ironstone Manor, Suite 15B
Pickering Ontario L1W 3W9
Phone: 905-831-1800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 650 Kingston Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Pickering
Pickering ON L1V 1A0
Phone: 905-839-1806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
General Site
3050 Lawrence Ave E.
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Centenary Site
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284-8131
Extension: 4135
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Birchmount Site
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 2S4
Phone: (416) 495-2480
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2880 Ellesmere Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Ellesmere Location
Scarborough ON M1E 4B8
Phone: 416-284-1697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 315-1333 Neilson Rd
Ellesmere X-Ray: Neilson Location
Scarborough ON M1B 4Y9
Phone: 416-287-1222
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Ll4-4040 Finch Ave E
Ellesmere X-Ray: Milliken Finch
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: 416-292-1505
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steve Gazzola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gazzola (CPSO#: 65241 )
Business Address: Scarborough Health Network General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: Rouge Valley Centenary
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-8131
Business Address: Bio-Test Radiology Services
2006 Robertson Road, Suite 16
Ottawa Ontario K2H 1A5
(613) 789-4242
Business Address: Don Valley X-Ray & Ultrasound Services Ltd.
855 Broadview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1Z1
(416) 461-9891
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
LL4 Basement
4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 292-1505
Business Address: Muskoka Algonguin Healthcare
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
(705) 645-4404
Business Address: Lakeview Diagnostics, EMP Diagnostic
Ultrasound Inc.
516 Lightfoot Place
Pickering Ontario L1V 5Z8
(905) 420-7158
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
650 Kingston Road
Unit 2, Building C
Pickering Ontario L1V 3N7
(905) 839-1806
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
Suite 107
601 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J5
(905) 683-8877
Business Address: Cleveland Clinic Canada
Suite 3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
(416) 507-6611
Business Address: Don Mills Diagnostic Imaging Inc.
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
(416) 449-2166
Business Address: 2352726 Ontario Inc
North York - X-Ray & Nuclear
250 Marlee Avenue
North York Ontario M6B 3H7
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: 103-2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 4W4
(416) 763-4331
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
2880 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1E 4B8
(416) 284-1697
Business Address: 103-3101 Bloor Street West
Etobicoke Ontario M8X 2W2
(416) 239-3568
Business Address: 2447648 Ontario Inc.
North York - US & XR
2640 Rutherford Road, Suite 102
Vaughan Ontario L4K 0H3
(905) 417-3001
Business Address: Ellesmere X-Ray
315 - 1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y9
(416) 284-1697
Business Address: Bio-Test Radiology Services
1929 Russell Road, Suite 102
Ottawa Ontario K1G 4G3
(613) 737-6872
Business Address: 2352726 Ontario Inc
250 Marlee Avenue
North York Ontario M6B 3H7
(416) 783-0000
Business Address: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
(705) 789-0022
Business Address: Rouge Valley Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 119-230 First Ave
Elgin Imaging Services
2581347 Ontario Limited
St Thomas ON N5R 4P5
519-282-5851
Business Address: 99 Firvalley Crt
Warden Woods X-Ray and Ultrasound
Scarborough ON M1L 1P2
416-699-6222
Business Address: 3-2 Thompson Cres
Erin Diagnostic Imaging
Erin ON N0B 1T0
Business Address: 1-1679 County Rd 22
St. Thomas Ultrasound Services - Belle River Imaging
Belle River ON N0R 1A0
Business Address: 207-510 Ingersoll Ave
Woodstock Diagnostic Imaging
2581347 Ontario Limited
Woodstock ON N4S 4X9
519-539-8888
Business Address: 468 Main St E
Beaverton X-Ray and Ultrasound
Beaverton ON L0K 1A0
705-504-0880
Business Address: 207-1980 St Clair Ave W
City X-Ray and Ultrasound
11003356 Canada Limited
Toronto ON M6N 0A3
416-534-8487
Business Address: 600 The East Mall
Ontario Imaging Centre - Etobicoke
AB6T Xray Only
Etobicoke ON M9B 4B0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVE GAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZZOLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVE GAZZOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAZZOLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2008

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992