THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-135 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167451661
Fax: 4167454496

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David C. Hacker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hacker (CPSO#: 65243 )
Business Address: 560 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Rexdale Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Address: 201-135 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 6V1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-135 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 6V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4167451661
Fax: 4167454496

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David C. Hacker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hacker (CPSO#: 65243 )
Business Address: 560 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Rexdale Ontario M9W 6V1
Business Address: 201-135 Queen's Plate Dr
Etobicoke ON M9W 6V1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID CHARLES HACKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HACKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992