THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:05:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43482
Fax: (705) 739-5629
Address: Georgian Radiology Consultants
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-4531
Fax: (705) 739-0810
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert B. Mason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mason (CPSO#: 65262 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43482
Fax: (705) 739-5629
Address: Georgian Radiology Consultants
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-4531
Fax: (705) 739-0810
Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Other Health and Non-Health Professions

PROFESSION JURISDICTION
Engineering, Professional Canada - Ontario
PROFESSION: Engineering, Professional
JURISDICTION: Canada - Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert B. Mason Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mason (CPSO#: 65262 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
LL01
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: The Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BARNES MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT BARNES MASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992