THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:03:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4900 Yonge St
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
North York ON M2N 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-952-0562
Fax: 416-952-0569

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison McGee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McGee (CPSO#: 65264 )
Business Address: 4900 Yonge St
4th Floor
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
North York ON M2N 6A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4900 Yonge St
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
North York ON M2N 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-952-0562
Fax: 416-952-0569

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Allison McGee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Apr 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. A. McGee (CPSO#: 65264 )
Business Address: 4900 Yonge St
4th Floor
Civil Aviation Medicine
Transport Canada
North York ON M2N 6A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON JANE MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON JANE MCGEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Aug 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2008

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2008

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2001

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992