THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 226 8777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 613 226 8777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David H. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marshall (CPSO#: 65270 )
Business Address: Suite 202
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 226-8777
Business Address: 1105 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G5
613 226 8777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1105 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 226 8777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 613 226 8777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital Smiths Falls Community Site
LOCATION: Smiths Falls

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David H. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Marshall (CPSO#: 65270 )
Business Address: Suite 202
1 Centrepointe Drive
Ottawa Ontario K2G 6E2
(613) 226-8777
Business Address: 1105 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G5
613 226 8777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HENRY MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HENRY MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992