THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Promenade Circle
3rd Floor, suite 301P
Thornhill Ontario L4J 4P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-1761
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Widrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Widrich (CPSO#: 65278 )
Business Address: Suite 301P
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill Ontario L4J 4P8
(905) 889-1761

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Promenade Circle
3rd Floor, suite 301P
Thornhill Ontario L4J 4P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 889-1761
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Guy Widrich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Widrich (CPSO#: 65278 )
Business Address: Suite 301P
1 Promenade Circle
Thornhill Ontario L4J 4P8
(905) 889-1761

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY VERNON WIDRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDRICH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GUY VERNON WIDRICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WIDRICH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992