THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:41:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)487-4261
Fax: (416)487-0969
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Akoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akoury (CPSO#: 65297 )
Business Address: 160 Strathgowan Ave
Toronto ON M4N 1C2
416-487-6241

Corporation Name: H. Akoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 206-7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)487-4261
Fax: (416)487-0969
Address: Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 31 May 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Akoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Akoury (CPSO#: 65297 )
Business Address: 160 Strathgowan Ave
Toronto ON M4N 1C2
416-487-6241

Corporation Name: H. Akoury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI ALBERT GEORGE AKOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKOURY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HANI ALBERT GEORGE AKOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKOURY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1992
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1992