THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:16:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Campus
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bellini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bellini (CPSO#: 65301 )
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre - Civic Campus
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 11 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-6362

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 11
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Address: William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Campus
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 30 Sep 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bellini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bellini (CPSO#: 65301 )
Business Address: William Osler Health Centre - Civic Campus
20 Lynch Street
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Business Address: 11 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 790-6362

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BRUNO BELLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW BRUNO BELLINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992