THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:32:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A Box 105
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzanne Strasberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Strasberg (CPSO#: 65318 )
Business Address: 136 A - 1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
(416) 745-4555

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkgate Mall
Suite 136A Box 105
1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 745-4555
Fax: (416) 745-0786

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1998
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzanne Strasberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Strasberg (CPSO#: 65318 )
Business Address: 136 A - 1 Yorkgate Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M3N 3A1
(416) 745-4555

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE ROBIN STRASBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUZANNE ROBIN STRASBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRASBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992