THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 17:42:20 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
14 E N - 215
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4642
Fax: (416) 595-5826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juurlink and Kapral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapral (CPSO#: 65328 ) Dr. D. Juurlink (CPSO#: 69280 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite G-106
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3039

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
14 E N - 215
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 340-4642
Fax: (416) 595-5826

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Juurlink and Kapral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapral (CPSO#: 65328 ) Dr. D. Juurlink (CPSO#: 69280 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite G-106
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 3039

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOIRA KASSIA KAPRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOIRA KASSIA KAPRAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPRAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992