THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:07:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
East York Ontario M4H 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-8800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd floor
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
Phone: 9052747044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pietro Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lombardi (CPSO#: 65331 )
Business Address: Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C4
(416) 425-8800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
East York Ontario M4H 1C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-8800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd floor
Mississauga Ontario L5H 1G9
Phone: 9052747044
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pietro Lombardi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lombardi (CPSO#: 65331 )
Business Address: Unit 4A
62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M4H 1C4
(416) 425-8800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIETRO LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIETRO LOMBARDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOMBARDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992