THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:35:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sexual Behaviours Clinic
Centre for Addiciton and Mental
Health, Unit 2, First Floor
1001 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34708
Fax: (416) 979-6965
Address: Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1J4
Phone: (416) 538-3839
Fax: (416) 538-8738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Woodside Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Woodside (CPSO#: 65338 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 979-4708
Business Address: Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1J6
(416) 538-3839

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sexual Behaviours Clinic
Centre for Addiciton and Mental
Health, Unit 2, First Floor
1001 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34708
Fax: (416) 979-6965
Address: Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1J4
Phone: (416) 538-3839
Fax: (416) 538-8738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Woodside Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Woodside (CPSO#: 65338 )
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 979-4708
Business Address: Queen Street Treatment Clinic
1194 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6J 1J6
(416) 538-3839

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MACDONALD WOODSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODSIDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SCOTT MACDONALD WOODSIDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODSIDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992