THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:05:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: G2-145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: Covenant House
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd floor
Toronto Ontario M5C1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John H. Langley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Langley (CPSO#: 65355 )
Business Address: Suite 5328
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 36473
Business Address: 20 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 2P3
(416) 240-7995
Business Address: 145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
416-591-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: G2-145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: Covenant House
c/o Inner City Health Associates
59 Adelaide St. E, 2nd floor
Toronto Ontario M5C1K6
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John H. Langley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Langley (CPSO#: 65355 )
Business Address: Suite 5328
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 36473
Business Address: 20 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M5B 2P3
(416) 240-7995
Business Address: 145 Front St E
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
416-591-4411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN HUBERT LANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN HUBERT LANGLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992