THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Howard Mutual Medical Centre
20129 Erie Street South
Po Box 667
Ridgetown Ontario N0P 2C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 674-2600
Fax: (866) 539-6714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prins (CPSO#: 65364 ) Dr. L. Prins (CPSO#: 65363 )
Business Address: 20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown Ontario N0P 2C0
(519) 674-2600

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Howard Mutual Medical Centre
20129 Erie Street South
Po Box 667
Ridgetown Ontario N0P 2C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 674-2600
Fax: (866) 539-6714

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Prins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Prins (CPSO#: 65364 ) Dr. L. Prins (CPSO#: 65363 )
Business Address: 20129 Erie Street South
Ridgetown Ontario N0P 2C0
(519) 674-2600

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD MARK PRINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD MARK PRINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992