THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:12:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Simon Cymerys
102-2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Phone: 905-333-0116
Fax: 905-333-5877
Date Received: 31 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MG Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robinson (CPSO#: 65365 )
Business Address: Cedar Springs Professional Centre
Suite D
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington Ontario L7N 3J6
(905) 639-3447
Business Address: 7310 Appleby Line
Milton ON L9E 0M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Burlington ON L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323730
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Simon Cymerys
102-2200 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7R 4H9
Phone: 905-333-0116
Fax: 905-333-5877
Date Received: 31 May 2023

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MG Robinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Robinson (CPSO#: 65365 )
Business Address: Cedar Springs Professional Centre
Suite D
960 Cumberland Avenue
Burlington Ontario L7N 3J6
(905) 639-3447
Business Address: 7310 Appleby Line
Milton ON L9E 0M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW GEORGE ROBINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992