THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:28:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 418
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 624-6922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saeedi-Tabar (CPSO#: 65388 )
Business Address: 418 - 1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1V5
(905) 624-6922

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 418
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4X 2Z9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 624-6922
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Saeedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Saeedi-Tabar (CPSO#: 65388 )
Business Address: 418 - 1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga Ontario L4W 1V5
(905) 624-6922

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHEIL SAEEDI-TABAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEEDI-TABAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOHEIL SAEEDI-TABAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAEEDI-TABAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992