THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 - 1110 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-6363
Fax: (416) 497-7610

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Silverstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silverstein (CPSO#: 65400 )
Business Address: Suite 306
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 497-6363

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 306 - 1110 Sheppard Ave E
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-6363
Fax: (416) 497-7610

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Carol Silverstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silverstein (CPSO#: 65400 )
Business Address: Suite 306
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 497-6363

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL SUZANNE SILVERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSTEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROL SUZANNE SILVERSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992