THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blaine (CPSO#: 65406 )
Business Address: 342 Erie Street
Suite 113
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
5192722040
Business Address: 519-272-2040

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Jenny Trout Centre
Suite 113
342 Erie Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 272-2040
Fax: (519) 272-2323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blaine (CPSO#: 65406 )
Business Address: 342 Erie Street
Suite 113
Stratford Ontario N5A 2N4
5192722040
Business Address: 519-272-2040

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2024

Corporation Name: Kirsten Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ANN BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN ANN BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992