THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:08:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
London Health Sciences Centre
West Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8500
Address: Dr. Jeffrey H Richmond, Dentistry
339 Westminster Avenue
London, Ontario
London ON N6C 4V3
Phone: 519-858-8370
Fax: 519-858-8375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Howard Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith (CPSO#: 65417 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6185
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8525
Business Address: 339 Westminster Avenue
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6C 4V3
(519) 858-8370
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
London Health Sciences Centre
West Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: (519) 685-8500
Address: Dr. Jeffrey H Richmond, Dentistry
339 Westminster Avenue
London, Ontario
London ON N6C 4V3
Phone: 519-858-8370
Fax: 519-858-8375

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Howard Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith (CPSO#: 65417 )
Business Address: 268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
(519) 646-6185
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 4G5
(519) 685-8525
Business Address: 339 Westminster Avenue
2nd Floor
London Ontario N6C 4V3
(519) 858-8370
Business Address: 339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HOWARD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HOWARD SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1991

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992