THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:08:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 634 2504
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brett Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Stevens (CPSO#: 65437 )
Business Address: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Address: 200 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 634-2504

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 634 2504
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brett Stevens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Stevens (CPSO#: 65437 )
Business Address: 201-460 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 4B6
Business Address: 200 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 634-2504

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT JEREMY DAVID STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRETT JEREMY DAVID STEVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992