THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:56:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue, 700U 6-328
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4495
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KAREN WL YEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yee (CPSO#: 65443 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
700U 6-328
Toronto ON M5G 2M9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 610 University Avenue, 700U 6-328
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4495
Fax: (416) 946-4563

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 18 Sep 1999
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 18 1999
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KAREN WL YEE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Yee (CPSO#: 65443 )
Business Address: 610 University Ave
700U 6-328
Toronto ON M5G 2M9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN WAI LING YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAREN WAI LING YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1992