THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:23:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 733-4411
Fax: (613) 733-3990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Lee Aubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubin (CPSO#: 65445 )
Business Address: Suite 405
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
(613) 733-4411

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 733-4411
Fax: (613) 733-3990

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Lee Aubin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Nov 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aubin (CPSO#: 65445 )
Business Address: Suite 405
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4G2
(613) 733-4411

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SUSAN LEE AUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY SUSAN LEE AUBIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AUBIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1992